Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain obsolete provisions of law relating to certain gaming activities and benefit performances in Montgomery County; and repealing a certain obsolete provision of law relating to certain benefit performances in Montgomery County.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {445760/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {445760/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Text - Chapter - Montgomery County - Gaming and Benefit Performances - Repeal MC 14-19
(   23-1 through 23-10, 30-4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page