Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Fisher, Amprey, Boyce, Charkoudian, Feldmark, Lehman, Palakovich Carr, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Replacing references to Columbus Day in certain provisions of law with references to Indigenous Peoples' Day; and establishing that Indigenous Peoples' Day is to be observed on October 12 or, if the United States Congress designates another day for the observance of Columbus Day, the day designated by the United States Congress.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0157 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
House 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/16/2022 2/16/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page