Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Inspector General - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Barkley, Bates, Beitzel, Bobo, Boteler, Bromwell, Cluster, Costa, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Feldman, Frank, George, Glass, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hough, Impallaria, Kramer, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, Myers, Norman, O'Donnell, Schuh, Schulz, Serafini, Smigiel, Stocksdale, F. Turner, and Wood
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the office of the Inspector General; specifying qualifications that an individual must meet to be eligible for the office; providing that the Inspector General is subject to removal by the General Assembly under specified circumstances; specifying the duties and powers of the Inspector General; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State of Maryland for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0819 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2013 3/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page