Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Beitzel, Buckel, Corderman, Glass, McComas, McKay, Parrott, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the right to an attorney or a nonattorney advocate for a student or student organization at public senior higher education institutions at certain disciplinary proceedings designed to address a violation of the institution's rules; requiring certain represented persons to pay for the attorney or nonattorney advocate; authorizing the attorney or nonattorney advocate to participate throughout the disciplinary proceedings, including by performing certain services; applying the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1033
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1142 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student Organizations
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
(   11-1401 through 11-1408 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page