Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Maryland Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - Business and Economic Development)
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the total amount of Maryland research and development credits that the Department of Business and Economic Development may approve and certify in a calendar year; applying the Act to tax credits approved and certified after December 15, 2013; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2013 2/06/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page