Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Belvoir-Scott's Plantation Historic Manor House
Sponsored by
Delegates Vitale and McConkey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $125,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Magnum Enterprises, LTD. and the Board of Directors of the Rockbridge Academy, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Belvoir-Scott's Plantation Historic Manor House in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0193
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page