Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Procedure - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsored by
Delegate Brooks
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the annual interest rate that the Comptroller sets for tax deficiencies and refunds as the lesser of 13% or 3 percentage points above the average prime rate of interest quoted by commercial banks to large businesses during the State's previous fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing cancelled
(   13-604 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page