Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee Processing
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Ebersole, Fennell, Tarlau, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain public school employers to provide an exclusive representative with access to new employee processing; requiring that the structure, time, and manner of certain access be determined through certain negotiations; authorizing certain parties to request certain impasse proceedings under certain circumstances; requiring the public school employer to provide the exclusive representative with certain information within 30 days of the date of hire or by the first pay period after the date of hire; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0819
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {605868/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {763129/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-84)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {123324/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-84)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (84-49)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {883528/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {733328/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee Processing
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {605868/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Cassilly) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {763129/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (49-84) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Floor Amendment {123324/1 (Delegate Cassilly) Rejected (50-84) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee Processing
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (84-49) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {883528/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Floor Amendment {733328/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Text - Chapter - Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee Processing
(   6-401, 6-407.1, 6-407.2, 6-408, 6-501, 6-509.1, 6-509.2, 6-510 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page