Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
Sponsored by
Delegates Hettleman, Acevero, Korman, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a constituent institution of the University System of Maryland to remove, suspend, or demote a regular full-time or part-time employee who is not on probation only for cause, on written charges and in accordance with certain provisions of law; and clarifying that the University System of Maryland may not remove, suspend, or demote a regular full-time or part-time employee for any reason prohibited by State antidiscrimination law.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0711
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214462/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {837572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-33)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {214462/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {837572/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (104-33) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Text - Chapter - University System of Maryland - Regular Employees - Grievance Procedures and Disciplinary Actions
(   12-111, 13-201, 13-205.1, 13-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page