Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates West and Hill
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring regulations adopted by the Board of Public Works to prohibit a unit from assessing liquidated damages for certain contracts for which a certain minority business enterprise was named on a participation schedule or named on a participation schedule and qualified based on a certain code; and providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Text - Chapter - Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page