Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Drug Products to Treat an Opioid Use Disorder - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Angel, Barron, Kelly, McMillan, Tarlau, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, Metzgar, Miele, Morales, Morgan, Pendergrass, Platt, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, West, K. Young, and Frick
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from applying a preauthorization requirement for a prescription drug to be used for treatment of an opioid use disorder and that contains methadone, buprenorphine, or naltrexone; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after the effective date of the Act.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {796789/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {286185/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Preauthorization for Drug Products to Treat Substance Use Disorders - Prohibition
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Favorable with Amendments {796789/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Floor Committee Amendment {286185/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Drug Products to Treat an Opioid Use Disorder - Prohibition
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Drug Products to Treat an Opioid Use Disorder - Prohibition
(   15-850 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page