Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Months – Caribbean Heritage Month
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Acevero, Anderson, Attar, B. Barnes, Bridges, Carr, Charkoudian, Charles, Clippinger, Conaway, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Ebersole, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, Harrison, Haynes, Ivey, Jalisi, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Washington, Wells, Wilkins, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Pendergrass, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the month of August as Caribbean Heritage Month in recognition of the contributions that Caribbean Americans have made to the State; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Caribbean Heritage Month in Maryland properly with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0472
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Caribbean Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {896689/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Caribbean Day
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {896689/1 Adopted 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - General Provisions – Commemorative Months – Caribbean Heritage Month
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules 56 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-504, 7-504 through 7-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page