Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Step Therapy or Fail-First Protocol
Sponsored by
Delegates Bromwell and Kach
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the duration of a step therapy or fail-first protocol imposed by a specified insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization; requiring the insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization to allow a prescriber of a covered prescription drug or device to have access to a process to override the step therapy or fail-first protocol; requiring the override process to allow a prescriber to override the step therapy or fail-first protocol; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0746
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
(   15-140 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page