Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Female Inmates and Inmates With Minor Children (Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to place an inmate who is a parent of a minor child in a correctional facility that is within 250 miles from the inmate's permanent address under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to adopt certain regulations authorizing visitation of an inmate by the inmate's minor children; prohibiting use of a physical restraint on a certain inmate who has delivered a baby at a certain time unless certain requirements are met; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Female Inmates and Inmates With Minor Children (Dignity for Incarcerated Women Act)
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   9-107, 9-601, 9-617 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page