Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Transfer Agreement - Number of Credits Allowed
Sponsored by
Delegate Rudolph
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing the number of general education, elective, and major course credits that are earned at specified community colleges in the State and that are transferable to a senior higher education institution in the State toward a bachelor's degree; providing that specified credits be transferred through an articulation agreement; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to develop and implement specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
(   11-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page