Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - All-Terrain or Utility-Terrain Vehicles for Agricultural Purposes
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Adams, Anderton, McComas, W. Miller, and Saab
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for the sale of an all-terrain or utility-terrain vehicle when purchased by a farmer and used exclusively for an agricultural purpose on the farmer's property.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0720
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - All-Terrain or Utility-Terrain Vehicles for Agricultural Purposes
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   11-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page