Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Sale and Distribution of Products Containing NMP and DCM - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Carr, Ebersole, Frush, Hill, Moon, Morhaim, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after January 1, 2020, the sale or distribution of any paint or coating removal product that contains N-Methylpyrrolidone or methylene chloride, also known as dichloromethane; and establishing a certain penalty for a certain violation.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Sale and Distribution of Products Containing NMP and DCM - Prohibition
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page