Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission to adopt certain procurement regulations relating to source selection; authorizing the Commission to adopt regulations establishing a minority business enterprise program if it determines that there is a compelling interest to implement remedial measures to assist certain minority- and women-owned businesses; requiring the Commission to report the findings of a certain study to certain persons on or before January 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {834536/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {834536/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Text - Chapter - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19
(   15-201, 15-201 through 15-205, 15-202, 15-203, 15-204, 15-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page