Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation – Bikeways Network Program and Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Codifying the Bikeways Network Program to provide grant support for bicycle network development activities; requiring the Department of Transportation to establish certain eligibility criteria; requiring the Governor to provide at least $3,800,000 each year from the Transportation Trust Fund for the Program; requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to present a draft transit plan 45 days before finalization to include provisions for reliable transit services to enable certain residents to access certain job opportunities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0787
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation - Bikeways Network Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714165/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation - Bikeways Network Program - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-33)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {159335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-33)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transportation - Bikeways Network Program - Funding
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {714165/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Transportation - Bikeways Network Program - Funding
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (101-33) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {159335/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (103-33) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Transportation – Bikeways Network Program and Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page