Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsored by
Delegates Oaks, McMillan, and Morhaim
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a dental practice to be owned, managed, and operated by a licensed dentist, subject to specified exceptions; authorizing unlicensed persons to take specified actions; authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to issue a cease and desist order for specified violations; altering the penalties for the unauthorized practice of dentistry; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0228
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016, July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
(   4-101, 4-102, 4-103, 4-301, 4-320.1, 4-601, 4-602, 4-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page