Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver’s Licenses – Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, Atterbeary, Barron, Robinson, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalties for a person convicted for possession of a canceled, revoked, or suspended driver's license to be a fine not exceeding $500 and an assessment of 3 points.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-17)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver’s Licenses – Penalties
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2018 3/17/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver’s Licenses – Penalties
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (120-17) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
(   16-301, 16-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page