Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Barron, Hayes, R. Lewis, Lierman, McCray, A. Miller, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the group of persons who may file a specified petition for postconviction DNA testing or a database or log search; requiring a court to order a new trial under specified circumstances for specified classes of persons filing for postconviction DNA testing and having received favorable results; altering the remedy for intentional and willful destruction of DNA evidence; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-42)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (97-42) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page