Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Mandatory Fees - Limit on Increases
Sponsored by
Delegate F. Turner
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the annual percentage increase in mandatory fees that may be charged each academic year to resident undergraduate and graduate students at public senior higher education institutions in the State.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
(   15-113 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page