Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Garrett County - Adventure Sports Center International
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 to allow funds authorized for the Adventure Sports Center International project to be used for prior eligible expenditures incurred on or before June 1, 2013; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1036
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
NOTE: The prior authorization was altered during the 2014 Session and was amended into the Capital Budget Bill (SB 171 ).
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2014 2/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page