Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Atterbeary, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hixson, C. Howard, McIntosh, Oaks, M. Washington, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund to be used to pay for specified reasonable and necessary administrative costs, not to exceed 5% of the specified appropriation to the MHT Grant Fund; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2018, to include an appropriation of $1,500,000 to the Fund in the annual State budget bill subject to specified limitations; limiting to 10% of all grants awarded the amount of grants from the Fund that may be awarded to historic properties owned by the Maryland Historic Trust; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1069
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204167/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-5)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {204167/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-5) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Text - Chapter - Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page