Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Sponsored by
Delegate Frick
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring innkeepers and hosting platform operators that offer certain types of limited residential lodging to operate in a certain manner; requiring that certain records be made available to certain entities; authorizing certain entities to order an innkeeper to cease and desist from offering limited residential lodging; providing that a hosting platform operator may not, except under certain circumstances, participate in or facilitate certain booking transactions; authorizing certain local jurisdictions to adopt certain laws; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation - Limited Residential Lodging
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   15-201, 15-208, 15-209 )
(   1-101, 4-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page