Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Single Registration Plate Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue a single registration plate to all classes of vehicles; providing for the method of attachment of the registration plate; and requiring the publisher of the Annotated Code of Maryland to make certain corrections in consultation with the Department of Legislative Services.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0061 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/18/2017
Legislative Date
7/18/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/18/2017 7/18/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Single Registration Plate Requirement
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   13-410, 13-411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page