Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local department of social services to place a child for a certain initial placement with a kinship caregiver as an alternative to foster care under certain circumstances; authorizing a local department to place a child with a kinship caregiver if a kinship caregiver is located subsequent to the placement of the child in a foster care setting; specifying that a kinship caregiver may not be under 21 years of age; authorizing a local department to approve an individual as a kinship caregiver under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1212
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/29/2018
Legislative Date
10/29/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2019
Legislative Date
2/01/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/29/2018 10/29/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/01/2019 2/01/2019 Referred Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
(   5-501, 5-534 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page