Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office of Crime Control and Prevention)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law establishing the Maryland Drug and Alcohol Grants Program Fund; repealing the authorization for the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to establish specified grant programs; repealing specified provisions of law establishing the Law Enforcement Equipment fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/19/2016
Legislative Date
9/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/19/2016 9/19/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Text - Chapter - Funds - Obsolete Provisions - Repeal
(   5-1001, 5-1002 )
(   4-301 through 4-304, 4-401 through 4-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page