Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations – Limited Liability Companies – Member–Trustees – Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the articles of organization for a limited liability company to include the name and address of each member of the limited liability company; providing that if the State Department of Assessments and Taxation issues a certain proclamation declaring that a limited liability company has forfeited certain rights, the members of the limited liability company become the trustees of its assets for certain purposes; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/02/2017
Legislative Date
10/02/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/02/2017 10/02/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Corporations – Limited Liability Companies – Member–Trustees – Establishment
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page