Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified alcohol- or drug-related offenses apply to a person operating a vessel propelled only by sail.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
10/11/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2013
Legislative Date
1/02/2013
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Colburn) Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed (35-10)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-8)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {532618/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2012 10/11/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/02/2013 1/02/2013 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Favorable 18
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Special Order until 2/6 (Senator Colburn) Adopted 18
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Second Reading Passed (35-10) 19
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Third Reading Passed (37-8) 21
House 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading Judiciary 24
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments {532618/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 67
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page