Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Requirement for Certificate of Need - Exceptions
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Veterans Affairs)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an exception to the requirement that a person have a certificate of need issued by the Maryland Health Care Commission before specified actions are taken relating to a health care facility by altering the definition of a "health care facility" to exclude a comprehensive care facility that is owned and operated by the Maryland Department of Veterans Affairs and that restricts admissions to specified individuals; and clarifying language.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/06/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2014
Legislative Date
1/02/2014
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/06/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2014 1/02/2014 Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 8
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Second Reading Passed 8
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 9
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 11
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page