Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception for qualified hybrid vehicles to the requirement that specified motor vehicles that are exempt from the vehicle emissions inspection program be driven not more than 5,000 miles annually; altering the information that owners of motor vehicles are required to certify to qualify for specified exemptions from the vehicle emissions inspection program; defining the term "qualified hybrid vehicle"; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   23-202, 23-206.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page