Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 3
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain annual appropriation in the State Budget for the Mayor and Alderman of the City of Annapolis to pay for services provided to the State by the City of Annapolis be at least $750,000; and requiring that each fiscal year starting in fiscal year 2022, the annual appropriation be increased by the increase in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for the Baltimore Metropolitan Statistical Area.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-5)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 3
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Referred Appropriations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-5) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 3
Text - Chapter - Mandated Appropriation - City of Annapolis - Services
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page