Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Small Claims - Jurisdictional Limit
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Kelley, Norman, and Ready
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $5,000 to $7,500 the minimum amount in controversy in civil cases over which the District Court and the circuit courts have concurrent jurisdiction; increasing from $5,000 to $7,500 the maximum amount of money over which the District Court has exclusive jurisdiction in a small claim action; increasing from $5,000 to $7,500 the minimum amount in controversy in civil cases in which appeals from the District Court are required to be heard on the record; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Small Claims - Jurisdictional Limit
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Small Claims - Jurisdictional Limit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts - Small Claims - Jurisdictional Limit
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Motion Special Order until 2/7 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Second Reading Passed 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Small Claims - Jurisdictional Limit
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Referred Judiciary 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
(   12-401, 4-402, 4-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page