Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Safe Schools Maryland Act of 2019
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (106-29)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Safe Schools Maryland Program in the Maryland Center for School Safety to establish procedures for anonymous reporting of behaviors, involving one or more students, that are of concern, dangerous, violent, or unlawful, or the threat of these activities; requiring the School Safety Subcabinet to develop program guidance for local school systems or schools by September 1, 2019; authorizing, if there are reasonable grounds to believe an individual is a threat to public safety, certain documents be provided to certain persons; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0148
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2019
Legislative Date
1/21/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Safe Schools Maryland Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294735/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Safe Schools Maryland Act of 2019
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {665967/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Love) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {125165/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-29)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2019 1/21/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Safe Schools Maryland Act of 2019
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {294735/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {294735/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Safe Schools Maryland Act of 2019
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Ways and Means 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {665967/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Love) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Floor Committee Amendment {125165/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-29) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
(   7-1513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page