Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds
Sponsored by
Senators King, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, Kelley, Manno, Peters, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 742
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to make a one-time transfer of no more than $50,000,000 from the State-supported fund balance to a quasi-endowment fund; and limiting the use of specified proceeds for facility renewal projects relating only to capital facilities used for State-supported activities.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0437
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0583 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 742
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Appropriations 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 742
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds
(   12-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page