Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Kagan, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that exclude from the jurisdiction of the juvenile court a child of a specified age alleged to have committed specified offenses; repealing provisions of law governing the transfer of specified criminal cases to the juvenile court; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0471
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0243 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   10-215, 10-216, 4-202, 4-202.1, 4-202.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page