Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Cassilly, Eckardt, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Rosapepe, Serafini, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, and Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing for a Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System to determine whether the General Assembly should create an independent school board for the Juvenile Services Education System and identify ways to reform and improve juvenile education services; requiring the Department of Juvenile Services and the State Department of Education to staff the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 20, 2020; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1223
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0657 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434930/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary Ways and Means
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {434930/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Judiciary Ways and Means 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page