Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain candidates for President or Vice President of the United States to file copies of certain federal tax returns and written consent for the disclosure of those tax returns with the State Board of Elections no later than 65 days before a presidential election; requiring the State Board to make these tax returns filed by a Presidential ticket publicly available on the State Board's website; prohibiting certain candidates who fail to satisfy the requirements of the Act from appearing on the general election ballot; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0662
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0358 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504331/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504331/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {473328/1 (Senator Hough)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Motion Lay Over for 1 Hour (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {473328/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (20-25)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {563423/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (20-24)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (20-26)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {213029/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hough) Rejected (18-28)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (28-17)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {504331/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {504331/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Floor Amendment {473328/1 (Senator Hough) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Motion Lay Over for 1 Hour (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Floor Amendment {473328/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (20-25) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Floor Amendment {563423/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (20-24) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (20-26) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Floor Amendment {213029/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-29) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hough) Rejected (18-28) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (28-17) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Referred Ways and Means 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-102, 8-503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page