Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that relate to exemptions for specified persons engaged in the business of manufacturing in St. Mary's County from specified taxes under specified circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0431
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Returned Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
(   131-1, 131-2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page