Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries
Sponsored by
Senator Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the salary of the Sheriff of St. Mary's County, the County Treasurer of St. Mary's County, and the State's Attorney for St. Mary's County; and providing for the application of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0682
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {340414/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/28/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {340414/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (35-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Sheriff, County Treasurer, and State's Attorney - Salaries
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page