Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Washington County to issue beer tasting, wine tasting, and liquor tasting licenses to holders of any class of beer, wine, and liquor license; providing that the beer tasting license authorizes the holder to allow the on-premises consumption of multiple varieties of beer for tasting from a single brand owner under certain circumstances; prohibiting a license holder from serving more than a certain amount of a single offering of beer to a single consumer; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1156
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting Licenses
(   31-102, 31-1307, 31-1308, 31-1309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page