Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsored by
Charles County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Transferring the Child Support Unit of the Office of the State's Attorney for Charles County to the Child Support Enforcement Administration of the Department of Human Resources; requiring that the employees be transferred in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring that specified transferred employees be given credit with the State for years of county employment for the purposes of determining specified retirement eligibility and also be subject to specified benefit selections in the Employees' Pension System; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0457
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments {187774/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Referred Appropriations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Text - Chapter - Charles County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Transfer of Personnel
(   10-117 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page