Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Currie, and Madaleno
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of expenses, as specified; requiring the Commission to review, assess, and examine matters and make findings and recommendations concerning procurements by State gaming facility licensees, as specified; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {759234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {759234/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commission to Study Compliance by State Gaming Facility Licensees With the State Minority Business Enterprise Program
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page