Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Employment Under Procurement Contracts - Study
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Benson, Currie, Kelley, Madaleno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to study the employment of ethnic minorities and women under procurement contracts at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; requiring the Office to review, assess, and examine certain matters related to the employment of ethnic minorities and women under procurement contracts at the Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; terminating the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs - Employment Under Procurement Contracts - Study
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Reassigned to Finance 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page