Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Edwards, Jennings, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Robinson, Waugh, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who, except in self-defense, intentionally inflicts bodily harm, permanent disability, or death on a service animal is guilty of the felony of aggravated cruelty to animals; prohibiting a person from making a false statement that an animal is a service animal for specified purposes; providing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to a maximum fine of $500; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0264 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   10-606 )
(   7-701, 7-705.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page