Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Oaks
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the 9-1-1 Director's Council to work with a specified Board and specified organizations to identify, plan for, coordinate, and make recommendations regarding the call-taking and dispatch operations of public safety answering points in the State; requiring the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems to work with the Maryland Association of Counties to secure specified staff and support; requiring the Council to report its recommendations to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1 each year; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {267674/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Revisions (Carl Henn's Law)
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {267674/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - 9-1-1 Director's Council (Carl Henn's Law)
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-501, 13-518 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page