Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interaction With Law Enforcement Officers - Development and Implementation of Curriculum Content
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh and Conway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a driver's license examination require an applicant to demonstrate the applicant's ability to take proper actions during a traffic stop; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include content in the standardized driver education curriculum on the proper interaction between individuals and law enforcement officers during stops; requiring the Administration to develop the curriculum content in consultation with the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights and the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674735/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Interaction With Law Enforcement Officers - Development and Implementation of Curriculum Content
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {674735/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Interaction With Law Enforcement Officers - Development and Implementation of Curriculum Content
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   16-110, 16-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page