Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the salary of each associate judge of the Orphans' Court for Prince George's County from $42,000 to $50,000, and the salary of the Chief Judge from $42,500 to $55,000 per year; and applying the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {688276/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page